Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Psychiatrist and Psychiatric Nurse Practitioner Telemedicine Reimbursement - Sunset Termination
Sponsored by
Delegate Kelly
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Finance
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing the termination provisions for certain provisions of law relating to the eligibility of psychiatrists and psychiatric nurse practitioners who provide Assertive Community Treatment or mobile treatment services to Maryland Medical Assistance Program recipients in a home or community-based setting through telemedicine to receive reimbursement for the health care services from the Program.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0056
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
9/08/2020
Legislative Date
9/08/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/23/2020
Legislative Date
12/23/2020
Action
Hearing 1/27 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2021
Legislative Date
2/10/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2021
Legislative Date
2/11/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
10AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/16/2021
Legislative Date
2/16/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (130-0)
Proceedings
12 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2021
Legislative Date
2/12/2021
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
13 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 9/08/2020 9/08/2020 Pre-filed
House 12/23/2020 12/23/2020 Hearing 1/27 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Psychiatrist and Psychiatric Nurse Practitioner Telemedicine Reimbursement - Sunset Termination
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/10/2021 2/10/2021 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 2/11/2021 2/11/2021 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 10AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Psychiatrist and Psychiatric Nurse Practitioner Telemedicine Reimbursement - Sunset Termination
House 2/16/2021 2/16/2021 Third Reading Passed (130-0) 12 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/17/2021 2/12/2021 Referred Finance 13 Click to view Recorded Media
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/22/2021 12:59 PM
Click to return on the top page