Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Department of General Services - Energy-Conserving Standards (Maryland Sustainable Buildings Act of 2020)
Sponsored by
Delegates Hill, Bagnall, Carr, Charkoudian, Cullison, Ebersole, Feldmark, Fraser-Hidalgo, Guyton, Healey, Lehman, R. Lewis, Lierman, Palakovich Carr, Reznik, Stein, Stewart, Terrasa, Bhandari, Johnson, Kelly, Kerr, Pena-Melnyk, K. Young
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of General Services to establish and periodically update certain standards for State buildings to conserve energy and minimize adverse impacts on birds; requiring the Department to reduce the lighting of existing State buildings in a certain manner; requiring the Maryland Green Building Council to include certain standards in any requirements that the Council establishes for participation in a higher performance building program; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0299
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0136 Session: 2019 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/16/2020
Legislative Date
1/16/2020
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations and Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2020
Legislative Date
1/21/2020
Action
Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2020
Legislative Date
1/22/2020
Action
Hearing canceled (Health and Government Operations)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2020
Legislative Date
1/22/2020
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {356480/1 Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/08/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (99-38)
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
46
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/16/2020 1/16/2020 First Reading Health and Government Operations and Appropriations
Text - First - Department of General Services - Energy-Conserving Standards (Maryland Sustainable Buildings Act of 2020)
House 1/21/2020 1/21/2020 Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
House 1/22/2020 1/22/2020 Hearing canceled (Health and Government Operations)
House 1/22/2020 1/22/2020 Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 3/09/2020 3/09/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/10/2020 3/07/2020 Favorable with Amendments {356480/1 Adopted 44
House 3/10/2020 3/07/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44
Text - Third - Department of General Services - Energy-Conserving Standards (Maryland Sustainable Buildings Act of 2020)
House 3/11/2020 3/08/2020 Third Reading Passed (99-38) 45
Senate 3/12/2020 3/07/2020 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 46
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 1:39 PM