Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety - Access to Firearms - Storage Requirements (Jaelynn's Law)
Sponsored by
Delegates Stein and Bartlett
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering a certain prohibition to prohibit a person from storing or leaving a firearm in a location where a minor could gain access to the firearm; altering a certain exception to the prohibition; establishing certain exceptions to the prohibition; prohibiting a person from storing or leaving a firearm in a location where an unsupervised minor could gain access to the firearm, an unsupervised minor does gain access to the firearm, and the firearm causes harm to the minor or another person; establishing certain penalties; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0479
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/30/2020
Legislative Date
10/30/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/05/2021
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/30/2020 10/30/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Public Safety - Access to Firearms - Storage Requirements (Jaelynn's Law)
House 2/05/2021 2/05/2021 Hearing 3/01 at 1:30 p.m.
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 4:25 PM
Click to return on the top page