Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Estates and Trusts - Wills and Advance Medical Directives - Notaries Public
Sponsored by
Delegate C. Jackson
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/04 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that a will may be made self-proved in a certain manner; establishing certain requirements for a self-proving will; requiring a certain self-proving will to be acknowledged by the testator before a notary public; requiring a certain self-proving affidavit to be attached or annexed to a self-proving will; altering the requirements of an advance medical directive; requiring a declarant to acknowledge a certain advance medical directive before a notary public; etc.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0519
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
7/28/2020
Legislative Date
7/28/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/23/2020
Legislative Date
12/23/2020
Action
Hearing 2/04 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 7/28/2020 7/28/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 12/23/2020 12/23/2020 Hearing 2/04 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - Estates and Trusts - Wills and Advance Medical Directives - Notaries Public
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 4:26 PM
Click to return on the top page