Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Environment and Natural Resources - Complaints, Inspections, and Enforcement - Information Maintenance and Reporting
Sponsored by
Delegate Lierman
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/27 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of the Environment to receive and process complaints involving suspected environmental violations in a certain manner; requiring the Department of the Environment to maintain and update certain information involving suspected environmental violations; requiring the Department of Natural Resources to report, on or before September 30 each year, to the Governor and the General Assembly certain information relating to the enforcement of natural resources and conservation laws; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0324
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
9/28/2020
Legislative Date
9/28/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/22/2020
Legislative Date
12/22/2020
Action
Hearing 1/27 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 9/28/2020 9/28/2020 Pre-filed
House 12/22/2020 12/22/2020 Hearing 1/27 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - Environment and Natural Resources - Complaints, Inspections, and Enforcement - Information Maintenance and Reporting
(   1-305 )
Last Updated: 1/31/2021 4:09 PM
Click to return on the top page