Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Unaccompanied Minors in Need of Shelter and Supportive Services
Sponsored by
Delegates Krimm, Valentino-Smith, Arikan, Bartlett, Acevero, Anderson, Bagnall, Carr, Ciliberti, Conaway, D.M. Davis, W. Fisher, Haynes, Hettleman, C. Jackson, M. Jackson, Kerr, Lehman, Lopez, McKay, Moon, Palakovich Carr, Pippy, Proctor, Rosenberg, Shetty, Solomon, Metzgar (By Request - Workgroup to Study Shelter and Supportive Services for Unaccompanied Homeless Minors)
Status
In the House - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing a certain unaccompanied minor in need of shelter to consent to shelter and supportive services under certain circumstances; authorizing an unaccompanied minor who is a parent to consent to shelter and supportive services for the minor's child; requiring a certain service provider to contact a parent, a guardian, or an adult relative of an unaccompanied minor within 72 hours; requiring a service provider to develop procedures to screen staff members who work with minors including a criminal history check; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0207
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/16/2020
Legislative Date
1/16/2020
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/16/2020
Legislative Date
1/16/2020
Action
Hearing 1/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Unaccompanied Minors in Need of Shelter and Supportive Services
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2020
Legislative Date
1/17/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2020
Legislative Date
1/17/2020
Action
Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {614868/1 Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Unaccompanied Minors in Need of Shelter and Supportive Services
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/08/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
51
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
50
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/16/2020 1/16/2020 First Reading Appropriations
House 1/16/2020 1/16/2020 Hearing 1/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Unaccompanied Minors in Need of Shelter and Supportive Services
House 1/17/2020 1/17/2020 Hearing canceled
House 1/17/2020 1/17/2020 Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 3/09/2020 3/09/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 3/10/2020 3/07/2020 Favorable with Amendments {614868/1 Adopted 44
House 3/10/2020 3/07/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44
Text - Third - Unaccompanied Minors in Need of Shelter and Supportive Services
House 3/11/2020 3/08/2020 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 45
Senate 3/12/2020 3/07/2020 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 46
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/16/2020 3/16/2020 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/16/2020 3/11/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 50
Senate 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 51
House 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Returned Passed 50
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-2701 through 4-2708 )
Last Updated: 4/1/2020 10:21 AM