Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Election Law – Early Voting Centers – Hours of Operation
Sponsored by
Delegate Washington
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring early voting centers to be open during the hours between 8 a.m. and 8 p.m. during each early voting day in elections other than a presidential general election.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0596
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1094 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/15/2020
Legislative Date
10/15/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/22/2020
Legislative Date
12/22/2020
Action
Hearing 1/19 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Election Law – Early Voting Centers – Hours of Operation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2021
Legislative Date
2/09/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2021
Legislative Date
2/11/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
10 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Election Law – Early Voting Centers – Hours of Operation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2021
Legislative Date
2/12/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (119-11)
Proceedings
11 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2021
Legislative Date
2/11/2021
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
12 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/15/2020 10/15/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Ways and Means
House 12/22/2020 12/22/2020 Hearing 1/19 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - Election Law – Early Voting Centers – Hours of Operation
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/09/2021 2/09/2021 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 2/11/2021 2/11/2021 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 10 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Election Law – Early Voting Centers – Hours of Operation
House 2/12/2021 2/12/2021 Third Reading Passed (119-11) 11 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/16/2021 2/11/2021 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 12 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 2/22/2021 12:56 PM
Click to return on the top page