Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Neonicotinoid Pesticides - Restrictions on Sales and Use (Pollinator Protection Act of 2016)
Sponsored by
Delegates Healey, Beidle, Beitzel, Carr, Fraser-Hidalgo, Frush, Gilchrist, Gutierrez, Holmes, Jalisi, Kaiser, Lafferty, Lam, Lierman, Luedtke, Moon, Morhaim, Pendergrass, B. Robinson, S. Robinson, Sydnor, M. Washington, and Zucker
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 662
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from selling, on or after January 1, 2018, a neonicotinoid pesticide unless the person also sells a restricted use pesticide; prohibiting a person from using a neonicotinoid pesticide on or after January 1, 2018, unless the person is a certified applicator or a person working under specified circumstances; requiring the Department of Agriculture to incorporate pollinator habitat expansion and enhancement practices into the State's Managed Pollinator Protection Plan; requiring a specified report; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0198
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0605 Session: 2015 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2016
Legislative Date
1/22/2016
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2016
Legislative Date
1/27/2016
Action
Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2016
Legislative Date
3/17/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/14/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {570015/2 Report Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/14/2016
Action
Special Order until next session (Delegate Hornberger) Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/15/2016
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate Hornberger) {603729/2 Rejected (45-94)
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/15/2016
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate Ghrist) {523929/1 Rejected (44-94)
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/15/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2016
Legislative Date
3/17/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (97-38)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/19/2016
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
3/30/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {104534/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
3/30/2016
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Hough) {813323/1 Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
3/30/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (34-12)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
House Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (99-38)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/31/2016
Legislative Date
5/28/2016
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 662
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/21/2016 1/22/2016 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 1/27/2016 1/27/2016 Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/16/2016 3/17/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/17/2016 3/14/2016 Favorable with Amendments {570015/2 Report Adopted 46
House 3/17/2016 3/14/2016 Special Order until next session (Delegate Hornberger) Adopted 46
House 3/17/2016 3/15/2016 Floor Amendment (Delegate Hornberger) {603729/2 Rejected (45-94) 47
House 3/17/2016 3/15/2016 Floor Amendment (Delegate Ghrist) {523929/1 Rejected (44-94) 47
House 3/17/2016 3/15/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47
House 3/19/2016 3/17/2016 Third Reading Passed (97-38) 49
Senate 3/21/2016 3/19/2016 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 48A
Senate 4/01/2016 4/04/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/05/2016 3/30/2016 Favorable with Amendments {104534/1 Report Adopted 59
Senate 4/05/2016 3/30/2016 Floor Amendment (Senator Hough) {813323/1 Adopted 59
Senate 4/05/2016 3/30/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 59
Senate 4/06/2016 3/31/2016 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (34-12) 60
House 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 House Concur - Senate Amendments 64
House 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Third Reading Passed (99-38) 64
House 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Passed Enrolled 64
Post Passage 5/31/2016 5/28/2016 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 662
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   12-101, 12-102, 12-103, 12-104, 5-201, 5-2A-01 through 5-2A-05 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM