Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Wetlands and Waterways – Riparian Rights – Prohibition on Termination or Impairment
Sponsored by
Delegate Malone
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting the Department of the Environment or the Board of Public Works from terminating or impairing the riparian rights of an individual, community association, or other entity through the application process for a permit or license to install a pier.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0021
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/30/2020
Legislative Date
10/30/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/22/2020
Legislative Date
12/22/2020
Action
Hearing 1/27 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/08/2021
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/30/2020 10/30/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 12/22/2020 12/22/2020 Hearing 1/27 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - Wetlands and Waterways – Riparian Rights – Prohibition on Termination or Impairment
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/08/2021 3/08/2021 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
(   16-201.1 )
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 4:26 PM
Click to return on the top page