Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure - Partial Expungement
Sponsored by
Delegates Barron, Carter, and Anderson
Status
In the Senate - Conference Committee Appointed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing a person to file a petition for a partial expungement of specified criminal records under specified circumstances; requiring a court to order that specified records be removed from a specified Web site; providing that only a specified record is eligible for partial expungement; repealing a provision of law establishing that if a person is not entitled to expungement of one charge or conviction in a specified unit the person is not entitled to expungement of any other charge or conviction in the unit; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0328
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0494 Session: 2012 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2016
Legislative Date
1/22/2016
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2016
Legislative Date
2/03/2016
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2016
Legislative Date
3/17/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/14/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {772519/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/14/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/15/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (90-48)
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/28/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {978577/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/28/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/29/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0)
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
House Requests Senate Recede
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
Conference Committee Appointed
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
Delegates Smith, Conaway, and Rosenberg
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Senate Refuses to Recede
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Conference Committee Appointed
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Senators Zirkin, Hough, and McFadden
Proceedings
63A
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/21/2016 1/22/2016 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/03/2016 2/03/2016 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/16/2016 3/17/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/17/2016 3/14/2016 Favorable with Amendments {772519/1 Report Adopted 46
House 3/17/2016 3/14/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46
House 3/17/2016 3/15/2016 Third Reading Passed (90-48) 47
Senate 3/21/2016 3/18/2016 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 47A
Senate 3/31/2016 4/01/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/01/2016 3/28/2016 Favorable with Amendments {978577/1 Report Adopted 57
Senate 4/01/2016 3/28/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 57
Senate 4/04/2016 3/29/2016 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0) 58
House 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments 65
House 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 House Requests Senate Recede 65
House 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 Conference Committee Appointed 65
House 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 Delegates Smith, Conaway, and Rosenberg 65
Senate 4/11/2016 4/03/2016 Senate Refuses to Recede 63A
Senate 4/11/2016 4/03/2016 Conference Committee Appointed 63A
Senate 4/11/2016 4/03/2016 Senators Zirkin, Hough, and McFadden 63A
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-105, 10-107 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM