Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Foreclosures - Baltimore County - Certificate of Vacancy or Certificate of Property Unfit for Human Habitation
Sponsored by
Baltimore County Delegation
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring Baltimore County to issue on request of a secured party a certificate of vacancy or a certificate of property unfit for human habitation for purposes of filing an order to docket or complaint to foreclose on residential property; and requiring that a certificate be issued or denied in Baltimore County within 14 days after the date of the request for the certificate.
Committees
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0712 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): January 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2017
Legislative Date
1/20/2017
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2017
Legislative Date
1/25/2017
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2017
Legislative Date
2/02/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2017
Legislative Date
2/24/2017
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2017
Legislative Date
3/18/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {860410/1 Adopted
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
46A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2017
Legislative Date
3/21/2017
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/20/2017 1/20/2017 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Foreclosures - Baltimore County - Certificate of Vacancy or Certificate of Property Unfit for Human Habitation
House 1/25/2017 1/25/2017 Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/02/2017 2/02/2017 Hearing canceled
House 2/24/2017 2/24/2017 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/18/2017 3/18/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/18/2017 3/15/2017 Favorable with Amendments {860410/1 Adopted 49
House 3/18/2017 3/15/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 49
Text - Third - Foreclosures - Baltimore County - Certificate of Vacancy or Certificate of Property Unfit for Human Habitation
House 3/20/2017 3/16/2017 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 50
Senate 3/20/2017 3/17/2017 Referred Judicial Proceedings 46A
Senate 3/21/2017 3/21/2017 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-105.11 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM