Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Motor Vehicle Insurance - Use of Credit History in Rating Policies
Sponsored by
Delegate Turner
Status
In the Senate - Second Reading Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring an insurer that uses credit information, with respect to private passenger motor vehicle insurance, to provide certain exceptions to the insurer's rates, ratings classifications, company or tier placement, and underwriting rules or guidelines to certain applicants and insureds on written request; applying the Act to all private passenger motor vehicle insurance policies issued, delivered, or renewed in the State on or after October 1, 2021; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0017 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
11/01/2020
Legislative Date
11/01/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Motor Vehicle Insurance - Use of Credit History in Rating Policies
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2021
Legislative Date
1/20/2021
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/10/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2021
Legislative Date
3/03/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {823097/1 Adopted
Proceedings
22 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2021
Legislative Date
3/03/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
22 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Motor Vehicle Insurance - Use of Credit History in Rating Policies
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/04/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (102-31)
Proceedings
23 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2021
Legislative Date
2/25/2021
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
26 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2021
Legislative Date
3/17/2021
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2021
Legislative Date
4/10/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/20/2021
Action
Favorable
Proceedings
45AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/20/2021
Action
Motion Special Order until 4/12 (Senator Young) Rejected
Proceedings
45AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/20/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
45AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/20/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
45AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 11/01/2020 11/01/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Motor Vehicle Insurance - Use of Credit History in Rating Policies
House 1/20/2021 1/20/2021 Hearing 2/11 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/10/2021 3/10/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/11/2021 3/03/2021 Favorable with Amendments {823097/1 Adopted 22 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/11/2021 3/03/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 22 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Motor Vehicle Insurance - Use of Credit History in Rating Policies
House 3/12/2021 3/04/2021 Third Reading Passed (102-31) 23 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2021 2/25/2021 Referred Finance 26 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2021 3/17/2021 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2021 4/10/2021 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 4/10/2021 3/20/2021 Favorable 45AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2021 3/20/2021 Motion Special Order until 4/12 (Senator Young) Rejected 45AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2021 3/20/2021 Favorable Adopted 45AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2021 3/20/2021 Second Reading Passed 45AClick to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/10/2021 4:09 PM
Click to return on the top page