Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Real Property - Residential Real Estate Transactions - Escrow Agents
Sponsored by
Delegate Holmes
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 349
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring an escrow agent to enter into a written agreement with the purchaser and the seller of certain residential real property when the escrow agent agrees to hold trust money in escrow for the residential real estate transaction; requiring a written agreement an escrow agent enters into with the purchaser and the seller to contain certain information; and applying the Act.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2019
Legislative Date
1/23/2019
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Real Property - Residential Real Estate Transactions - Escrow Agents
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2019
Legislative Date
1/29/2019
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2019
Legislative Date
2/25/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2019
Legislative Date
2/26/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {620112/1 Adopted
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2019
Legislative Date
2/26/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
35
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Real Property - Residential Real Estate Transactions - Escrow Agents
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2019
Legislative Date
2/28/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/01/2019
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
4/04/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
62A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
62A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/30/2019
Legislative Date
4/30/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 349
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Real Property - Residential Real Estate Transactions - Escrow Agents
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/23/2019 1/23/2019 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Real Property - Residential Real Estate Transactions - Escrow Agents
House 1/29/2019 1/29/2019 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 2/25/2019 2/25/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 2/26/2019 2/26/2019 Favorable with Amendments {620112/1 Adopted 35
House 2/26/2019 2/26/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 35
Text - Third - Real Property - Residential Real Estate Transactions - Escrow Agents
House 2/28/2019 2/28/2019 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 37
Senate 3/01/2019 3/01/2019 Referred Judicial Proceedings 37
Senate 3/12/2019 3/12/2019 Hearing 3/20 at 12:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/04/2019 4/04/2019 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Favorable Adopted 62A
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Second Reading Passed 62A
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 63
House 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Returned Passed 67
Post Passage 4/30/2019 4/30/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 349
Text - Chapter - Real Property - Residential Real Estate Transactions - Escrow Agents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-802 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM