Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Pilots - Recreational Vessels - Employment Requirement
Sponsored by
Delegate Hammen
Status
Veto sustained (0-141)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring that a recreational vessel that meets specified parameters employ a licensed pilot to pilot the vessel when it is underway on the navigable waters of the State; defining a certain term; and making the Act an emergency measure.
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: SB0215
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/01/0001
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
Veto sustained (0-141)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2015
Legislative Date
2/02/2015
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2015
Legislative Date
2/04/2015
Action
Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2015
Legislative Date
2/23/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2015
Legislative Date
2/24/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
30
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2015
Legislative Date
2/24/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
30
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2015
Legislative Date
2/26/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-1)
Proceedings
32
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2015
Legislative Date
2/27/2015
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
32
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2015
Legislative Date
4/08/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/01/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/01/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/01/0001 1/13/2016 Veto sustained (0-141)
House 1/30/2015 2/02/2015 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/04/2015 2/04/2015 Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/20/2015 2/23/2015 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 2/24/2015 2/24/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 30
House 2/24/2015 2/24/2015 Second Reading Passed 30
House 2/26/2015 2/26/2015 Third Reading Passed (134-1) 32
Senate 2/27/2015 2/27/2015 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 32
Senate 4/07/2015 4/08/2015 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/08/2015 4/01/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 59
Senate 4/08/2015 4/01/2015 Second Reading Passed 59
Senate 4/09/2015 4/02/2015 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 60
House 4/10/2015 4/04/2015 Returned Passed 65
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM