Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Circuit Court Judges - Election
Sponsored by
Delegates Kramer and Hill
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Proposing an amendment to the Maryland Constitution relating to the selection and tenure of circuit court judges; altering the method of filling vacancies in the office of a judge of a circuit court; providing for retention elections following an appointment to fill a vacancy in the office of a judge of a circuit court; providing for a transitional period under which the terms of specified amendments are to become effective; submitting the amendment to the qualified voters of the State for their adoption or rejection; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Ways and Means
Details
Constitutional Bill
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0548 Session: 2015 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Contingency - on a referendum
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2016
Legislative Date
1/22/2016
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2016
Legislative Date
1/27/2016
Action
Reassigned to Judiciary and Ways and Means
Proceedings
11
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2016
Legislative Date
2/03/2016
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2016
Legislative Date
3/14/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/21/2016 1/22/2016 First Reading Ways and Means
House 1/27/2016 1/27/2016 Reassigned to Judiciary and Ways and Means 11
House 2/03/2016 2/03/2016 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
House 3/14/2016 3/14/2016 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM