Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Prince George’s County – Ethics – Limitations on Applicant Campaign Contributions PG 404–19
Sponsored by
Prince George's County Delegation
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing a prohibition on an applicant or applicant's agent making a payment to the County Executive of Prince George's County or a slate that includes the County Executive during the pendency of certain applications.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2019
Legislative Date
1/23/2019
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2019
Legislative Date
1/24/2019
Action
Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2019
Legislative Date
3/16/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (108-28)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/16/2019
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2019
Legislative Date
3/19/2019
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/23/2019 1/23/2019 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Prince George’s County – Ethics – Limitations on Applicant Campaign Contributions PG 404–19
House 1/24/2019 1/24/2019 Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 3/16/2019 3/16/2019 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 3/16/2019 3/13/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 48
Text - Third - Prince George’s County – Ethics – Limitations on Applicant Campaign Contributions PG 404–19
House 3/18/2019 3/14/2019 Third Reading Passed (108-28) 49
Senate 3/18/2019 3/16/2019 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 48
Senate 3/19/2019 3/19/2019 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-833, 5-835 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM