Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Pesticides - Use of Chlorpyrifos - Prohibition
Sponsored by
Delegates Stein, Acevero, Bartlett, Barve, Charles, Ebersole, Feldmark, Forbes, Fraser-Hidalgo, Gilchrist, Guyton, Hettleman, Holmes, Kelly, Korman, Lehman, R. Lewis, Lierman, Lisanti, Love, McIntosh, Patterson, Pena-Melnyk, Queen, Reznik, Rosenberg, Shetty, Stewart, Valderrama, Wilkins, P. Young, Brooks, Cardin, D.M. Davis, Healey, Moon, Palakovich Carr, Carr, C. Watson, Terrasa, Solomon, and Williams
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting the aerial application of chlorpyrifos on or after October 1, 2020; prohibiting the use of chlorpyrifos in the State on or after December 31, 2020; establishing the Pesticide Transition Fund to support Maryland farmers in the transition away from the use of chlorpyrifos and to support the work of the Pesticide Transition Task Force, including research on integrated pest management and implementation of the State's plan to transition away from the use of chlorpyrifos; establishing the Pesticide Transition Task Force; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0300
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0275 Session: 2019 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/16/2020
Legislative Date
1/16/2020
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Pesticides - Use of Chlorpyrifos - Prohibition
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2020
Legislative Date
1/21/2020
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {490217/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Pesticides - Use of Chlorpyrifos - Prohibition
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (99-34)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
50
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/16/2020 1/16/2020 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Pesticides - Use of Chlorpyrifos - Prohibition
House 1/21/2020 1/21/2020 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/14/2020 3/14/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/14/2020 3/11/2020 Favorable with Amendments {490217/1 Adopted 48
House 3/14/2020 3/11/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48
Text - Third - Pesticides - Use of Chlorpyrifos - Prohibition
House 3/15/2020 3/12/2020 Third Reading Passed (99-34) 49
Senate 3/16/2020 3/11/2020 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 50
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-210.6, 5-210.7 )
Last Updated: 3/16/2020 6:50 PM