Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Environment - Polystyrene Food Service Products and Polystyrene Loose Fill Packaging - Prohibition on Sale
Sponsored by
Delegates Lierman, Barkley, Carr, Fennell, Fraser-Hidalgo, Frush, Gilchrist, Hettleman, Lafferty, McIntosh, Morhaim, Robinson, Rosenberg, Stein, Tarlau, M. Washington, and West
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from selling in the State specified expanded polystyrene food service products or loose fill packaging on or after January 1, 2018; prohibiting specified food service businesses from selling or providing food in specified expanded polystyrene food service products on or after January 1, 2018; requiring a county health department to impose specified penalties for violations of the Act; requiring a county health department to notify the Department of the Environment specified violations; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0186
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2017
Legislative Date
1/20/2017
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation and Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2017
Legislative Date
1/25/2017
Action
Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/20/2017 1/20/2017 First Reading Environment and Transportation and Economic Matters
Text - First - Environment - Polystyrene Food Service Products and Polystyrene Loose Fill Packaging - Prohibition on Sale
House 1/25/2017 1/25/2017 Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-2101 through 9-2106 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM