Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - Intersections - Prohibited Acts
Sponsored by
Delegates Carr, Korman, Robinson, and Tarlau
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting vehicle traffic from entering specified intersections against specified traffic signals if the vehicle is unable to safely and completely proceed through the intersection.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0779
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2017
Legislative Date
1/20/2017
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Vehicle Laws - Intersections - Prohibited Acts
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2017
Legislative Date
1/23/2017
Action
Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Hearing 2/09 at 1:15 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2017
Legislative Date
2/20/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2017
Legislative Date
2/21/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {690117/1 Adopted
Proceedings
30
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2017
Legislative Date
2/21/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
30
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Vehicle Laws - Intersections - Prohibited Acts
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2017
Legislative Date
2/23/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until 2/24 (Delegate Glass) Adopted
Proceedings
32
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2017
Legislative Date
2/24/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (121-15)
Proceedings
33
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2017
Legislative Date
2/27/2017
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
32
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/20/2017 1/20/2017 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Vehicle Laws - Intersections - Prohibited Acts
House 1/23/2017 1/23/2017 Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Hearing canceled
House 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Hearing 2/09 at 1:15 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 2/20/2017 2/20/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 2/21/2017 2/21/2017 Favorable with Amendments {690117/1 Adopted 30
House 2/21/2017 2/21/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 30
Text - Third - Vehicle Laws - Intersections - Prohibited Acts
House 2/23/2017 2/23/2017 Motion Special Order until 2/24 (Delegate Glass) Adopted 32
House 2/24/2017 2/24/2017 Third Reading Passed (121-15) 33
Senate 2/27/2017 2/27/2017 Referred Judicial Proceedings 32
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   21-202 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM