Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2013 - Talbot County - Easton Head Start Center
Sponsored by
Delegate Cane
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 90
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Attorney General's Review Letter
Synopsis
Amending the Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2013 to authorize the matching fund of a grant for the Easton Head Start Center to consist of funds expended prior to June 1, 2013; making the Act an emergency measure; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Opposite:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: SB0256
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/16/2014
Legislative Date
1/17/2014
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2014
Legislative Date
1/29/2014
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2014
Legislative Date
2/17/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2014
Legislative Date
2/18/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
30
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2014
Legislative Date
2/18/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
30
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2014
Legislative Date
2/20/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (128-4)
Proceedings
32
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2014
Legislative Date
2/21/2014
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
31
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2014
Legislative Date
2/24/2014
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2014
Legislative Date
2/26/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2014
Legislative Date
2/26/2014
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 2:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2014
Legislative Date
3/10/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2014
Legislative Date
3/07/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
41A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2014
Legislative Date
3/07/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
41A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2014
Legislative Date
3/09/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
43
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2014
Legislative Date
3/10/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/08/2014
Legislative Date
4/08/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 90
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/16/2014 1/17/2014 First Reading Appropriations
House 1/29/2014 1/29/2014 Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/14/2014 2/17/2014 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 2/18/2014 2/18/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 30
House 2/18/2014 2/18/2014 Second Reading Passed 30
House 2/20/2014 2/20/2014 Third Reading Passed (128-4) 32
Senate 2/21/2014 2/21/2014 First Reading Budget and Taxation 31
Senate 2/24/2014 2/24/2014 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/26/2014 2/26/2014 Hearing cancelled
Senate 2/26/2014 2/26/2014 Hearing 3/05 at 2:30 p.m.
Senate 3/10/2014 3/10/2014 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/10/2014 3/07/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 41A
Senate 3/10/2014 3/07/2014 Second Reading Passed 41A
Senate 3/12/2014 3/09/2014 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 43
House 3/13/2014 3/10/2014 Returned Passed 46
Post Passage 4/08/2014 4/08/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 90
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM