Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Election Law - State Elected Officials - Campaign Fund-Raising During General Assembly Session - Civil Penalty
Sponsored by
Delegates Rosenberg and A. Washington
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 203
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Clarifying that specified persons are prohibited from soliciting a contribution during the General Assembly session; authorizing the State Board of Elections to impose a civil penalty for a violation by a campaign finance entity of the prohibition on fund-raising during the General Assembly session; repealing provisions of law authorizing the State Board, represented by the State Prosecutor, to institute a civil action in a circuit court against a campaign finance entity for violating the prohibition on fund-raising during the session; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0408
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2016
Legislative Date
1/25/2016
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2016
Legislative Date
1/28/2016
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2016
Legislative Date
2/22/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2016
Legislative Date
2/23/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {175462/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
30
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2016
Legislative Date
2/23/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
30
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2016
Legislative Date
2/25/2016
Action
Special Order until 2/26 (Delegate Kipke) Adopted
Proceedings
32
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2016
Legislative Date
2/26/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (131-3)
Proceedings
33
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/29/2016
Legislative Date
2/29/2016
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
33
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/26/2016
Legislative Date
4/26/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 203
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/25/2016 1/25/2016 First Reading Ways and Means
House 1/28/2016 1/28/2016 Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/19/2016 2/22/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 2/23/2016 2/23/2016 Favorable with Amendments {175462/1 Report Adopted 30
House 2/23/2016 2/23/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 30
House 2/25/2016 2/25/2016 Special Order until 2/26 (Delegate Kipke) Adopted 32
House 2/26/2016 2/26/2016 Third Reading Passed (131-3) 33
Senate 2/29/2016 2/29/2016 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 33
Senate 4/05/2016 4/06/2016 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/06/2016 3/31/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 60
Senate 4/06/2016 3/31/2016 Second Reading Passed 60
Senate 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 61
House 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Returned Passed 64
Post Passage 4/26/2016 4/26/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 203
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-235, 13-604.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM