Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - License and Registration Renewal - Denial
Sponsored by
Delegates Rosenberg, Valentino-Smith, and Lierman
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Exempting an applicant for renewal or transfer of a vehicle registration from the requirement that the applicant be denied if the applicant has unpaid taxes or unemployment insurance contributions if the applicant's income is at or below 200% of the federal poverty level, the applicant's principal tax liability is below $10,000, or the applicant qualifies for Currently Not Collectible status under the Internal Revenue Manual; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2019
Legislative Date
1/24/2019
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Vehicle Laws - License and Registration Renewal - Denial
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2019
Legislative Date
1/29/2019
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2019
Legislative Date
2/05/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2019
Legislative Date
2/05/2019
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/24/2019 1/24/2019 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Vehicle Laws - License and Registration Renewal - Denial
House 1/29/2019 1/29/2019 Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/05/2019 2/05/2019 Hearing canceled
House 2/05/2019 2/05/2019 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/27/2019 3/27/2019 Withdrawn by Sponsor
(   13-406.2, 16-115 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page