Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Allegany County - Property Tax Credit - Cumberland Economic Development Corporation
Sponsored by
Allegany County Delegation
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 117
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the governing body of Allegany County and of a municipal corporation in Allegany County to grant, by law, a property tax credit against the county or municipal corporation property tax imposed on property owned by the Cumberland Economic Development Corporation; and applying the Act to taxable years beginning after June 30, 2019.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Opposite:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0214
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2019
Legislative Date
1/24/2019
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2019
Legislative Date
1/24/2019
Action
Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2019
Legislative Date
3/07/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/08/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
43
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/09/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2019
Legislative Date
3/22/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2019
Legislative Date
3/20/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
53
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
53A
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2019
Legislative Date
4/18/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 117
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/24/2019 1/24/2019 First Reading Ways and Means
House 1/24/2019 1/24/2019 Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Allegany County - Property Tax Credit - Cumberland Economic Development Corporation
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 3/07/2019 3/07/2019 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 3/08/2019 3/08/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 43
Text - Third - Allegany County - Property Tax Credit - Cumberland Economic Development Corporation
House 3/12/2019 3/09/2019 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 44
Senate 3/12/2019 3/12/2019 Referred Budget and Taxation 44
Senate 3/15/2019 3/15/2019 Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/22/2019 3/22/2019 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/22/2019 3/20/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 52
Senate 3/25/2019 3/21/2019 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 53
House 3/26/2019 3/18/2019 Returned Passed 53A
Post Passage 4/18/2019 4/18/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 117
Text - Chapter - Allegany County - Property Tax Credit - Cumberland Economic Development Corporation
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM