Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Sunday Permit - Hours of Sale
Sponsored by
Frederick County Delegation
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 81
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a holder of a specified alcoholic beverages license in Frederick County who has been granted a Sunday opening permit to sell specified alcoholic beverages for on-premises consumption at a specified event that the Frederick County Board of License Commissioners has approved; providing that the Board set the hours for the event; and making the Act an emergency measure.
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: SB0501
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2015
Legislative Date
2/02/2015
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2015
Legislative Date
2/04/2015
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2015
Legislative Date
3/02/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/03/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {903097/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/03/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2015
Legislative Date
3/05/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/06/2015
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
4/06/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/30/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/30/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2015
Legislative Date
3/31/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2015
Legislative Date
4/01/2015
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/14/2015
Legislative Date
4/14/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 81
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/02/2015 2/02/2015 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/04/2015 2/04/2015 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/27/2015 3/02/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/03/2015 3/03/2015 Favorable with Amendments {903097/1 Report Adopted 35
House 3/03/2015 3/03/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 35
House 3/05/2015 3/05/2015 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 37
Senate 3/06/2015 3/06/2015 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 37
Senate 4/03/2015 4/06/2015 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/06/2015 3/30/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 57
Senate 4/06/2015 3/30/2015 Second Reading Passed 57
Senate 4/07/2015 3/31/2015 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 58
House 4/07/2015 4/01/2015 Returned Passed 62
Post Passage 4/14/2015 4/14/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 81
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM