Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Notice for License Applications, Fees, and Inspectors
Sponsored by
Frederick County Delegation
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 232
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the Board of License Commissioners for Frederick County to fulfill a notice requirement for license applications by posting online a completed application with all submitted documents on or before a specified date; eliminating the fees for a specified certificate of permission and a specified license; repealing the requirement that the Governor appoint a full-time inspector; authorizing the Board to appoint a chief inspector and one full-time or two part-time inspectors; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0503
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2015
Legislative Date
2/02/2015
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2015
Legislative Date
2/04/2015
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2015
Legislative Date
3/02/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/03/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {303197/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/03/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2015
Legislative Date
3/05/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/06/2015
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2015
Legislative Date
4/01/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2015
Legislative Date
3/27/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2015
Legislative Date
3/27/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2015
Legislative Date
3/28/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
55
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/30/2015
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 232
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/02/2015 2/02/2015 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/04/2015 2/04/2015 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/27/2015 3/02/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/03/2015 3/03/2015 Favorable with Amendments {303197/1 Report Adopted 35
House 3/03/2015 3/03/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 35
House 3/05/2015 3/05/2015 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 37
Senate 3/06/2015 3/06/2015 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 37
Senate 3/31/2015 4/01/2015 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/01/2015 3/27/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 54
Senate 4/01/2015 3/27/2015 Second Reading Passed 54
Senate 4/02/2015 3/28/2015 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 55
House 4/03/2015 3/30/2015 Returned Passed 60
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 232
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-202, 10-506, 15-103 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM