Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure - Victim Services Unit - Victims' Compensation
Sponsored by
Chair, Judiciary Committee (By Request - Departmental - Office of Crime Control and Prevention)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 422
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing a Victim Services Unit in the Governor's Office of Crime Control and Prevention; transferring existing functions and operations of the Criminal Injuries Compensation Board and the sexual assault forensic examinations program to the Unit; requiring the Criminal Injuries Compensation Board office to remain in Baltimore City until at least July 1, 2020, for the purpose of accepting claims, providing assistance on filing claims, and holding hearings; requiring certain employees to maintain a certain work location; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0963
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1428 Session: 2017 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/19/2018
Legislative Date
1/19/2018
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/18/2018
Legislative Date
1/18/2018
Action
Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Criminal Procedure - Victim Services Unit - Victims' Compensation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2018
Legislative Date
3/10/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {502819/1 Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2018
Legislative Date
3/10/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Criminal Procedure - Victim Services Unit - Victims' Compensation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/11/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {638473/1 Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
House Requests Senate Recede
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Morhaim, Sanchez and McComas)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
House Requests Senate Recede
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Morhaim, Sanchez and McComas)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
Senate Refuses Recede
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Hough, Lee and Kelley)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Senate Refuses Recede
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Hough, Lee and Kelley)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
Conference Committee Report {823221/1 Adopted
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Conference Committee Report {823221/1 Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Criminal Procedure - Victim Services Unit - Victims' Compensation
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2018
Legislative Date
5/08/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 422
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Criminal Procedure - Victim Services Unit - Victims' Compensation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/19/2018 1/19/2018 First Reading Judiciary
House 1/18/2018 1/18/2018 Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Criminal Procedure - Victim Services Unit - Victims' Compensation
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 3/12/2018 3/12/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/13/2018 3/10/2018 Favorable with Amendments {502819/1 Adopted 44
House 3/13/2018 3/10/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44
Text - Third - Criminal Procedure - Victim Services Unit - Victims' Compensation
House 3/14/2018 3/11/2018 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 45
Senate 3/15/2018 3/15/2018 Referred Judicial Proceedings 47
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/02/2018 4/02/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/03/2018 3/29/2018 Favorable with Amendments {638473/1 Adopted 60
Senate 4/03/2018 3/29/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 60
Senate 4/04/2018 3/30/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 61
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments 61
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 House Requests Senate Recede 61
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Morhaim, Sanchez and McComas) 61
Senate 4/06/2018 4/01/2018 House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments 63
Senate 4/06/2018 4/01/2018 House Requests Senate Recede 63
Senate 4/06/2018 4/01/2018 House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Morhaim, Sanchez and McComas) 63
Senate 4/06/2018 4/01/2018 Senate Refuses Recede 63
Senate 4/06/2018 4/01/2018 Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Hough, Lee and Kelley) 63
House 4/06/2018 3/29/2018 Senate Refuses Recede 63
House 4/06/2018 3/29/2018 Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Hough, Lee and Kelley) 63
House 4/09/2018 4/01/2018 Conference Committee Report {823221/1 Adopted 66
House 4/09/2018 4/01/2018 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 66
Senate 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 Conference Committee Report {823221/1 Adopted 65
Senate 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 65
House 4/09/2018 4/01/2018 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Criminal Procedure - Victim Services Unit - Victims' Compensation
Post Passage 5/08/2018 5/08/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 422
Text - Chapter - Criminal Procedure - Victim Services Unit - Victims' Compensation
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-1007, 11-1101 through 11-1105, 11-801, 11-803, 11-804, 11-805, 11-814, 11-815, 11-816.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM