Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Election Law - Accommodations for Voters in Need of Assistance
Sponsored by
Delegate Guyton
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the training materials used by the program of instruction for election judges to include oral and written instructions in the various methods an election judge may use to accommodate voters in need of assistance; requiring the State Board to produce materials to be posted at polling places relating to accommodations for voters in need of assistance; Requiring a chief election judge to give voting order priority to persons with mobility problems, a person assisting others with mobility problems, and persons with a disabled child; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0142 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
7/08/2020
Legislative Date
7/08/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/22/2020
Legislative Date
12/22/2020
Action
Hearing 1/19 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2021
Legislative Date
2/15/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/16/2021
Legislative Date
2/16/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {613929/1 Adopted
Proceedings
12 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/16/2021
Legislative Date
2/16/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
12 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Election Law - Accommodations for Voters in Need of Assistance
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2021
Legislative Date
2/18/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-0)
Proceedings
13 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2021
Legislative Date
2/13/2021
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
14 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 7/08/2020 7/08/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Ways and Means
House 12/22/2020 12/22/2020 Hearing 1/19 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - Election Law - Voting Order Priority - Individuals Who Need Extra Assistance
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/15/2021 2/15/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 2/16/2021 2/16/2021 Favorable with Amendments {613929/1 Adopted 12 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/16/2021 2/16/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 12 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Election Law - Accommodations for Voters in Need of Assistance
House 2/18/2021 2/18/2021 Third Reading Passed (132-0) 13 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/19/2021 2/13/2021 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 14 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 2/22/2021 12:59 PM
Click to return on the top page