Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Commercial Motor Vehicles - Inspections
Sponsored by
Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/14 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the mileage at which the owner of a Class F (tractor) vehicle that has been in operation for not more than 5 years is required to have the vehicle inspected, maintained, and repaired to 35,000 miles; and altering the mileage at which the owner of certain Class E vehicles that have been in operation for not more than 5 years is required to have the vehicle inspected, maintained, and repaired to 50,000 miles if the vehicles are zero-emission electric vehicles or fuel cell electric vehicles.
Committees
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1505 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
9/30/2020
Legislative Date
9/30/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/22/2020
Legislative Date
12/22/2020
Action
Hearing 1/14 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Commercial Motor Vehicles - Inspections
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 9/30/2020 9/30/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 12/22/2020 12/22/2020 Hearing 1/14 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - Commercial Motor Vehicles - Inspections
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/18/2021 3:42 PM