Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Final Protective Orders – Relief – Transfer of Wireless Telephone Service
Sponsored by
Delegates Valentino-Smith, Atterbeary, Dumais, Fennell, W. Fisher, Lehman, McComas, Pena-Melnyk, Proctor, Stewart, and Sydnor
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing a court, in a final protective order, to order a wireless telephone service provider to transfer to a person eligible for relief the billing responsibility for and the right to continue the use of any telephone number used by the person eligible for relief or a minor child in the person's custody if the person eligible for relief is not the account holder; requiring a wireless telephone service provider to comply with a certain order unless the wireless telephone service provider notifies the court of certain circumstances; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Opposite:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2019
Legislative Date
1/24/2019
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Protective Orders - Relief - Transfer of Wireless Telephone Service
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2019
Legislative Date
1/24/2019
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/06/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2019
Legislative Date
3/07/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {412816/1 Adopted
Proceedings
42
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2019
Legislative Date
3/07/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
42
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/08/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
4/04/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/24/2019 1/24/2019 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Protective Orders - Relief - Transfer of Wireless Telephone Service
House 1/24/2019 1/24/2019 Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 3/06/2019 3/06/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/07/2019 3/07/2019 Favorable with Amendments {412816/1 Adopted 42
House 3/07/2019 3/07/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 42
Text - Third - Final Protective Orders – Relief – Transfer of Wireless Telephone Service
House 3/08/2019 3/08/2019 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 43
Senate 3/11/2019 3/11/2019 Referred Judicial Proceedings 43
Senate 3/12/2019 3/12/2019 Hearing 3/20 at 12:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/04/2019 4/04/2019 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-506, 4-506.2 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM