Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Task Force to Study Phased Retirement for Maryland State Employees
Sponsored by
Delegates Rosenberg, DeBoy, and Griffith
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/21 at 8:30 a.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Task Force to Study Phased Retirement for Maryland State Employees; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Task Force; requiring the Task Force to study and make recommendations regarding a phased retirement option for experienced State employees; requiring the Task Force to report its findings and recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before December 1, 2013; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Opposite:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0800
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2013
Legislative Date
1/23/2013
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2013
Legislative Date
1/23/2013
Action
Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2013
Legislative Date
3/04/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/05/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/05/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2013
Legislative Date
3/07/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-2)
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2013
Legislative Date
3/08/2013
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
41
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 8:30 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/22/2013 1/23/2013 First Reading Appropriations
House 1/23/2013 1/23/2013 Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m.
House 3/01/2013 3/04/2013 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 3/05/2013 3/05/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 40
House 3/05/2013 3/05/2013 Second Reading Passed 40
House 3/07/2013 3/07/2013 Third Reading Passed (136-2) 42
Senate 3/08/2013 3/08/2013 First Reading Budget and Taxation 41
Senate 3/20/2013 3/20/2013 Hearing 3/21 at 8:30 a.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM