Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Historically Black Colleges and Universities – Independence From University System of Maryland
Sponsored by
Delegate Ivey
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Reorganizing State government by establishing Bowie State University, Coppin State University, and University of Maryland Eastern Shore as independent universities; prohibiting the inclusion of Bowie State University, Coppin State University, and University of Maryland Eastern Shore within the University System of Maryland; designating certain historically black colleges and universities as certain entities; providing that certain historically black colleges and universities have certain responsibilities; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
8/31/2020
Legislative Date
8/31/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2021
Legislative Date
2/01/2021
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/16/2021
Legislative Date
2/16/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2021
Legislative Date
2/22/2021
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 8/31/2020 8/31/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Historically Black Colleges and Universities – Independence From University System of Maryland
House 2/01/2021 2/01/2021 Hearing 2/17 at 1:30 p.m.
House 2/16/2021 2/16/2021 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/22/2021 2/22/2021 Withdrawn by Sponsor
(   12-101,   12-101.1,   14-501 through 14-513, 14-601 through 14-613, 14-701 through 14-713 )
Last Updated: 2/22/2021 12:20 PM
Click to return on the top page