Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Residential Electricity and Gas Supply Billing Information - Reports
Sponsored by
Delegate D.E. Davis
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring certain persons to submit to the Public Service Commission beginning July 1, 2021, monthly reports containing detailed billing information on the supply of electricity and gas to certain residential customers; requiring certain initial reports to include information from the previous 12 months; providing for the required contents of each report; requiring certain information to be organized by low-income customers and all other customers; requiring the Commission to make each report available to certain persons; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0686
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2020
Legislative Date
1/20/2020
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Residential Electricity and Gas Supply Billing Information - Reports
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2020
Legislative Date
1/24/2020
Action
Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/20/2020 1/20/2020 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Residential Electricity and Gas Supply Billing Information - Reports
House 1/24/2020 1/24/2020 Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/6/2020 11:46 AM