Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Local Government - Sexual Assault Cases - Local Audits
Sponsored by
Delegates Queen, Morales, Anderson, Angel, Clippinger, Conaway, Dumais, Fraser-Hidalgo, Glenn, Hayes, Kaiser, Kelly, Korman, R. Lewis, Lierman, Luedtke, A. Miller, Moon, Platt, Reznik, Robinson, Tarlau, M. Washington, K. Young, and Hettleman
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing a county or municipality to conduct a third-party audit of specified sexual assault cases; requiring a county or municipality to arrange a third-party audit of sexual assault cases under specified circumstances, subject to specified guidelines; establishing the requirements for a third-party audit of sexual assault cases; requiring the Office of the Attorney General to establish and maintain guidelines for third-party audits of sexual assault cases; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0780
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2017
Legislative Date
1/23/2017
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Local Government - Sexual Assault Cases - Local Audits
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2017
Legislative Date
1/25/2017
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2017
Legislative Date
3/14/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2017
Legislative Date
3/11/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {184168/1 Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2017
Legislative Date
3/11/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Local Government - Sexual Assault Cases - Local Audits
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/12/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
46A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
45
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/23/2017 1/23/2017 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Local Government - Sexual Assault Cases - Local Audits
House 1/25/2017 1/25/2017 Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 3/14/2017 3/14/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 3/14/2017 3/11/2017 Favorable with Amendments {184168/1 Adopted 45
House 3/14/2017 3/11/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45
Text - Third - Local Government - Sexual Assault Cases - Local Audits
House 3/15/2017 3/12/2017 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 46A
Senate 3/16/2017 3/16/2017 Referred Judicial Proceedings 45
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM