Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release Services Program - Victim Notification
Sponsored by
Delegate Atterbeary
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a judicial officer to consider the recommendation of a certain pretrial release services program in making a certain determination; requiring a court or District Court commissioner to consider including certain no-contact provisions as a condition of pretrial release if a certain pretrial release services program has made a certain request; requiring a certain pretrial release services program to notify the court on receipt of certain information; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0551
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1520 Session: 2018 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2019, October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2019
Legislative Date
1/25/2019
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2019
Legislative Date
1/25/2019
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/06/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2019
Legislative Date
3/07/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
42
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/08/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
43
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/25/2019 1/25/2019 First Reading Judiciary
House 1/25/2019 1/25/2019 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release Services Program - Victim Notification
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 3/06/2019 3/06/2019 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 3/07/2019 3/07/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 42
Text - Third - Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release Services Program - Victim Notification
House 3/08/2019 3/08/2019 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 43
Senate 3/11/2019 3/11/2019 Referred Judicial Proceedings 43
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   1-101, 11-104, 11-106, 11-914, 5-103, 5-201, 5-213 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM