Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Video Lottery Terminal Proceeds - Racetrack Facility Renewal Account - Racecourse at Timonium
Sponsored by
Delegate Guyton
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring that, for each of fiscal years 2021 through 2025, a certain amount of video lottery terminal proceeds distributed to the Racetrack Facility Renewal Account for certain racing licensees be allocated in a certain manner to the racecourse at Timonium for racetrack facility capital construction and improvements; repealing a provision of law that authorizes the holder of a racing license to race at the racecourse at Timonium to use a certain amount of money to support a certain number of racing days; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Committee Testimony
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0643 Session: 2019 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2020
Legislative Date
1/20/2020
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2020
Legislative Date
1/21/2020
Action
Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2020
Legislative Date
1/28/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/20/2020 1/20/2020 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Video Lottery Terminal Proceeds - Racetrack Facility Renewal Account - Racecourse at Timonium
House 1/21/2020 1/21/2020 Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
House 1/28/2020 1/28/2020 Hearing canceled
House 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 1:42 PM