Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Senior Higher Education Institutions - Financial Aid - Reduction Restrictions
Sponsored by
Delegates Stein, Ebersole, Beidle, Brooks, Ciliberti, Gutierrez, Hettleman, Korman, Lierman, Luedtke, McCray, Morhaim, Pena-Melnyk, Platt, Tarlau, A. Washington, West, K. Young, and P. Young
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 332
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing financial aid awarded by a public senior higher education institution to be reduced only under specified circumstances; authorizing financial aid awarded by a public senior higher education institution to be reduced up to a specified amount under specified circumstances; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0327
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2017
Legislative Date
1/23/2017
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2017
Legislative Date
1/25/2017
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2017
Legislative Date
3/10/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2017
Legislative Date
3/10/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {804962/1 Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2017
Legislative Date
3/10/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {123521/1 (Delegate Stein) Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2017
Legislative Date
3/10/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/14 (Delegate Rey) Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2017
Legislative Date
3/11/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/12/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-2)
Proceedings
46A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {224239/1 Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-1)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2017
Legislative Date
4/18/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 332
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/23/2017 1/23/2017 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Public Senior Higher Education Institutions - Financial Aid - Reduction Restrictions
House 1/25/2017 1/25/2017 Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 3/10/2017 3/10/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 3/13/2017 3/10/2017 Favorable with Amendments {804962/1 Adopted 44
House 3/13/2017 3/10/2017 Floor Amendment {123521/1 (Delegate Stein) Adopted 44
House 3/13/2017 3/10/2017 Motion Special Order until 3/14 (Delegate Rey) Adopted 44
House 3/14/2017 3/11/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45
Text - Third - Public Senior Higher Education Institutions - Financial Aid - Reduction Restrictions
House 3/15/2017 3/12/2017 Third Reading Passed (135-2) 46A
Senate 3/16/2017 3/16/2017 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 45
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/03/2017 4/03/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/04/2017 3/29/2017 Favorable with Amendments {224239/1 Adopted 58
Senate 4/04/2017 3/29/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 58
Senate 4/05/2017 3/30/2017 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 59
House 4/08/2017 4/01/2017 House Concurs Senate Amendments 66
House 4/08/2017 4/01/2017 Third Reading Passed (135-1) 66
House 4/08/2017 4/01/2017 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Public Senior Higher Education Institutions - Financial Aid - Reduction Restrictions
Post Passage 4/18/2017 4/18/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 332
Text - Chapter - Public Senior Higher Education Institutions - Financial Aid - Reduction Restrictions
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   15-121 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM