Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Automobile Insurance - Usage-Based Insurance - Application and Notice
Sponsored by
Delegate Dumais
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing that the application of a certain insurance program on vehicle operation during the current policy period is not a violation of certain restrictions on classification for private passenger motor vehicle insurance; excluding the application of certain provisions on exclusion of drivers to an insurance program that measures the operation of an insured vehicle during the current policy period; and requiring that a certain notice include certain information for a premium increase due to a certain insurance program.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0195
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2020
Legislative Date
1/20/2020
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Automobile Insurance - Usage-Based Insurance - Application and Notice
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2020
Legislative Date
1/24/2020
Action
Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2020
Legislative Date
2/04/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2020
Legislative Date
2/04/2020
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/20/2020 1/20/2020 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Automobile Insurance - Usage-Based Insurance - Application and Notice
House 1/24/2020 1/24/2020 Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m.
House 2/04/2020 2/04/2020 Hearing canceled
House 2/04/2020 2/04/2020 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/13/2020 4:05 PM