Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Higher Education - Collective Bargaining - Graduate Assistants (Graduate Assistant Collective Bargaining Fairness Act)
Sponsored by
Delegates Korman, Boyce, Healey, Hettleman, Ivey, Jalisi, Kelly, R. Lewis, Love, Luedtke, Moon, Palakovich Carr, Pena-Melnyk, Pendergrass, Reznik, Shetty, Solomon, Stewart, Terrasa, and Valderrama
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Finance
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing collective bargaining rights to certain graduate assistants at certain public institutions of higher education; establishing a separate collective bargaining unit for certain graduate assistants; and altering certain exceptions to the applicability of provisions of law governing collective bargaining for State employees.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Opposite:
Finance
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0491
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0199 Session: 2018 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2019
Legislative Date
1/25/2019
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2019
Legislative Date
1/29/2019
Action
Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/09/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (94-42)
Proceedings
46A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
47
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/25/2019 1/25/2019 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Higher Education - Collective Bargaining - Graduate Assistants (Graduate Assistant Collective Bargaining Fairness Act)
House 1/29/2019 1/29/2019 Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 3/11/2019 3/11/2019 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 3/12/2019 3/09/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 44
Text - Third - Higher Education - Collective Bargaining - Graduate Assistants (Graduate Assistant Collective Bargaining Fairness Act)
House 3/14/2019 3/11/2019 Third Reading Passed (94-42) 46A
Senate 3/15/2019 3/15/2019 Referred Finance 47
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-101, 3-102, 3-403 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM