Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Higher Education - Collective Bargaining - Graduate Assistants (Graduate Assistant Collective Bargaining Fairness Act)
Sponsored by
Delegates Korman, Boyce, Healey, Hettleman, Ivey, Jalisi, Kelly, R. Lewis, Love, Luedtke, Moon, Palakovich Carr, Pena-Melnyk, Pendergrass, Reznik, Shetty, Solomon, Stewart, Terrasa, and Valderrama
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Finance
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing collective bargaining rights to certain graduate assistants at certain public institutions of higher education; establishing a separate collective bargaining unit for certain graduate assistants; and altering certain exceptions to the applicability of provisions of law governing collective bargaining for State employees.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0491
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0199 Session: 2018 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2019
Legislative Date
1/25/2019
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2019
Legislative Date
1/29/2019
Action
Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/09/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (94-42)
Proceedings
46AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/25/2019 1/25/2019 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Higher Education - Collective Bargaining - Graduate Assistants (Graduate Assistant Collective Bargaining Fairness Act)
House 1/29/2019 1/29/2019 Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/11/2019 3/11/2019 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 3/12/2019 3/09/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Higher Education - Collective Bargaining - Graduate Assistants (Graduate Assistant Collective Bargaining Fairness Act)
House 3/14/2019 3/11/2019 Third Reading Passed (94-42) 46AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2019 3/15/2019 Referred Finance 47 Click to view Recorded Media
(   3-101, 3-102, 3-403 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page