Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - Certificate of Title Fee - Trailer Gifted to Family Member
Sponsored by
Delegate Szeliga
Status
In the House - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Reducing the certificate of title fee to $50 for a trailer with gross vehicle weight of 3,000 pounds or less if the trailer is transferred to a spouse, child, grandchild, parent, sibling, grandparent, father-in-law, mother-in-law, son-in-law, daughter-in-law of the transferor, or a niece or nephew of the transferor if the transferor is at least 65 years of age at the time of the transfer; and prohibiting the involvement of money or other valuable considerations in the transfer.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2020
Legislative Date
1/20/2020
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2020
Legislative Date
1/21/2020
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2020
Legislative Date
2/24/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2020
Legislative Date
2/25/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {420514/1 Adopted
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2020
Legislative Date
2/25/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2020
Legislative Date
2/27/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2020
Legislative Date
2/28/2020
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/17/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
51A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
51A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
52
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/20/2020 1/20/2020 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Vehicle Laws - Certificate of Title Fee - Trailer Gifted to Family Member
House 1/21/2020 1/21/2020 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 2/24/2020 2/24/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 2/25/2020 2/25/2020 Favorable with Amendments {420514/1 Adopted 35
House 2/25/2020 2/25/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 35
Text - Third - Vehicle Laws - Certificate of Title Fee - Trailer Gifted to Family Member
House 2/27/2020 2/27/2020 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 37
Senate 2/28/2020 2/28/2020 Referred Judicial Proceedings 38
Senate 3/09/2020 3/09/2020 Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/15/2020 3/15/2020 Hearing canceled
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/17/2020 3/17/2020 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/17/2020 3/12/2020 Favorable Adopted 51A
Senate 3/17/2020 3/12/2020 Second Reading Passed 51A
Senate 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 52
House 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Returned Passed 52
File Code
Subjects
Age
Statutes
Last Updated: 3/23/2020 9:02 AM