Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Child Support - Extraordinary Medical Expenses
Sponsored by
Delegate Dumais
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the definition of "extraordinary medical expenses" under the child support guidelines.
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0635 Session: 2011 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2016
Legislative Date
1/25/2016
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2016
Legislative Date
1/27/2016
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2016
Legislative Date
3/17/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/14/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/14/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/15/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2016
Legislative Date
3/23/2016
Action
Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/25/2016 1/25/2016 First Reading Judiciary
House 1/27/2016 1/27/2016 Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/16/2016 3/17/2016 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 3/17/2016 3/14/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 46
House 3/17/2016 3/14/2016 Second Reading Passed 46
House 3/17/2016 3/15/2016 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 47
Senate 3/21/2016 3/18/2016 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 47A
Senate 3/23/2016 3/23/2016 Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
(   12-201, 12-204 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM
Click to return on the top page