Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Natural Resources - State and Local Forest Conservation Funds
Sponsored by
Delegates Lafferty, B. Barnes, Cain, Cassilly, Dumais, Gilchrist, Impallaria, Lehman, Lierman, Lisanti, Love, Stewart, Wells, and P. Young
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 601
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring a person that is subject to the Forest Conservation Act to demonstrate that appropriate credits generated by a forest mitigation bank in the same county or watershed are not available before the person may pay money to a State or local forest conservation fund to meet certain requirements; prohibiting a local authority from collecting money for deposit into its forest conservation fund unless it has submitted to the Department of Naural Resources the mitigation plan and accounting procedures; applying the Act prospectively; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0234
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2019
Legislative Date
1/25/2019
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Natural Resources - State and Local Forest Conservation Funds
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2019
Legislative Date
1/31/2019
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2019
Legislative Date
2/28/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/01/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {900515/1 Adopted
Proceedings
38
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/01/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Natural Resources - State and Local Forest Conservation Funds
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/05/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (122-17)
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/06/2019
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (43-0)
Proceedings
59A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2019
Legislative Date
5/25/2019
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 601
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Natural Resources - State and Local Forest Conservation Funds
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/25/2019 1/25/2019 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Natural Resources - State and Local Forest Conservation Funds
House 1/31/2019 1/31/2019 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 2/28/2019 2/28/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/01/2019 3/01/2019 Favorable with Amendments {900515/1 Adopted 38
House 3/01/2019 3/01/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 38
Text - Third - Natural Resources - State and Local Forest Conservation Funds
House 3/05/2019 3/05/2019 Third Reading Passed (122-17) 40
Senate 3/06/2019 3/06/2019 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 40
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/01/2019 4/01/2019 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/01/2019 3/26/2019 Favorable Adopted 58
Senate 4/01/2019 3/26/2019 Second Reading Passed 58
Senate 4/02/2019 3/27/2019 Third Reading Passed (43-0) 59A
House 4/03/2019 3/24/2019 Returned Passed 59
Post Passage 5/25/2019 5/25/2019 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 601
Text - Chapter - Natural Resources - State and Local Forest Conservation Funds
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-1610, 5-1613 )
Last Updated: 2/11/2020 9:08 AM