Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Wine Events, Licensing, Alcohol Awareness Requirements, and Fines
Sponsored by
Frederick County Delegation
Status
Veto sustained (0-141)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Restricting the number of bottles of wine that may remain open at any one time at a wine sampling or tasting event in Frederick County to all bottles in a wine preservation system that the Board of License Commissioners approves and not more than six other bottles; altering the qualifications for signatories of a certificate accompanying a license application; providing for an alternative method for selecting signatories under specified circumstances; authorizing the Board to reduce a suspension under specified circumstances; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0500
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/01/0001
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
Veto sustained (0-141)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2015
Legislative Date
2/04/2015
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2015
Legislative Date
2/04/2015
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2015
Legislative Date
3/02/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/03/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/03/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2015
Legislative Date
3/05/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/06/2015
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
4/06/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/30/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {464939/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/30/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2015
Legislative Date
3/31/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
House Concur - Senate Amendment
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/01/0001 1/13/2016 Veto sustained (0-141)
House 2/03/2015 2/04/2015 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/04/2015 2/04/2015 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/27/2015 3/02/2015 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/03/2015 3/03/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 35
House 3/03/2015 3/03/2015 Second Reading Passed 35
House 3/05/2015 3/05/2015 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 37
Senate 3/06/2015 3/06/2015 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 37
Senate 4/03/2015 4/06/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/06/2015 3/30/2015 Favorable with Amendments {464939/1 Report Adopted 57
Senate 4/06/2015 3/30/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 57
Senate 4/07/2015 3/31/2015 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0) 58
House 4/08/2015 4/02/2015 House Concur - Senate Amendment 63
House 4/08/2015 4/02/2015 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 63
House 4/08/2015 4/02/2015 Passed Enrolled 63
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-103, 13-101, 16-507, 8-406.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM