Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Frederick County - Gaming Events
Sponsored by
Frederick County Delegation
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 234
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing specified organizations in Frederick County to conduct a card game, card tournament, or casino event under specified circumstances; requiring an organization to obtain a permit from the Frederick County Department of Permits and Inspections; requiring an individual who participates in a card game, card tournament, or casino event to be at least 21 years of age; requiring a permit holder to submit a financial report and specified information about the winners of specified prizes; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Opposite:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0510
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2015
Legislative Date
2/04/2015
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/12/2015
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/19/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {925061/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/19/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2015
Legislative Date
3/21/2015
Action
Special Order until later today (Delegate Vaughn) Adopted
Proceedings
51
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2015
Legislative Date
3/21/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-1)
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2015
Legislative Date
3/21/2015
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2015
Legislative Date
3/25/2015
Action
Hearing 3/31 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/09/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {309834/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/06/2015
Action
House Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/06/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-1)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/06/2015
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 234
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/03/2015 2/04/2015 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/12/2015 2/12/2015 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/19/2015 3/20/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/20/2015 3/19/2015 Favorable with Amendments {925061/1 Report Adopted 49
House 3/20/2015 3/19/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 49
House 3/23/2015 3/21/2015 Special Order until later today (Delegate Vaughn) Adopted 51
House 3/23/2015 3/21/2015 Third Reading Passed (138-1) 51
Senate 3/24/2015 3/21/2015 First Reading Budget and Taxation 48
Senate 3/25/2015 3/25/2015 Hearing 3/31 at 2:00 p.m.
Senate 4/08/2015 4/09/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/09/2015 4/02/2015 Favorable with Amendments {309834/1 Report Adopted 60
Senate 4/09/2015 4/02/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 60
Senate 4/10/2015 4/03/2015 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0) 61
House 4/11/2015 4/06/2015 House Concur - Senate Amendments 67
House 4/11/2015 4/06/2015 Third Reading Passed (136-1) 67
House 4/11/2015 4/06/2015 Passed Enrolled 67
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 234
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-1304.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM