Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Financial Institutions - Security Questions and Measures
Sponsored by
Delegate C. Watson
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Finance
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring a financial institution that requires a customer to provide an answer to a security question for a certain purpose to allow a customer to choose from at least two security question options for each required security question; prohibiting a financial institution from using a customer's mother's maiden name as a means of safeguarding access to the customer's account; and applying the Act prospectively.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Finance
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0160
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2020
Legislative Date
1/20/2020
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Financial Institutions - Security Questions and Measures
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2020
Legislative Date
1/24/2020
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2020
Legislative Date
3/02/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2020
Legislative Date
3/03/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {283793/1 Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2020
Legislative Date
3/03/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Financial Institutions - Security Questions and Measures
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2020
Legislative Date
3/05/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (95-43)
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2020
Legislative Date
3/03/2020
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
42
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/20/2020 1/20/2020 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Financial Institutions - Security Questions and Measures
House 1/24/2020 1/24/2020 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/02/2020 3/02/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/03/2020 3/03/2020 Favorable with Amendments {283793/1 Adopted 40
House 3/03/2020 3/03/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 40
Text - Third - Financial Institutions - Security Questions and Measures
House 3/05/2020 3/05/2020 Third Reading Passed (95-43) 42
Senate 3/06/2020 3/03/2020 Referred Finance 42
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 3/17/2020 4:12 PM