Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Individual Income Tax - Brackets and Rates - Alteration
Sponsored by
Delegate Smith
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/28 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the rates and rate brackets under the State income tax on certain income of individuals; and applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2021.
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1190 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/21/2020
Legislative Date
10/21/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Individual Income Tax - Brackets and Rates - Alteration
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/07/2021
Legislative Date
1/07/2021
Action
Hearing 1/28 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Ways and Means
House 10/21/2020 10/21/2020 Pre-filed
Text - First - Individual Income Tax - Brackets and Rates - Alteration
House 1/07/2021 1/07/2021 Hearing 1/28 at 1:30 p.m.
Last Updated: 2/1/2021 10:02 AM
Click to return on the top page