Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Regional Initiative to Limit or Reduce Greenhouse Gas Emissions in Transportation Sector - Authorization (Regional Transportation and Climate Protection Act of 2019)
Sponsored by
Delegates Korman, Bagnall, Bartlett, Bhandari, Brooks, Charkoudian, Crutchfield, Dumais, Ebersole, Gaines, Haynes, Healey, Hettleman, Ivey, Jones, Kerr, R. Lewis, Lierman, Love, Luedtke, Palakovich Carr, Reznik, Shetty, Smith, Solomon, Stein, Stewart, Valderrama, K. Young, and P. Young
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 605
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the Governor to include the State as a full participant in a regional governmental initiative, agreement, or compact that limits or reduces greenhouse gas emissions from the transportation sector; requiring the Department of the Environment and the Department of Transportation to submit a report on the status of any regional initiative, agreement or compact that limits or reduces greenhouse gas emissions from the transportation sector to the General Assembly on or before November 1, 2019; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0249
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2019
Legislative Date
1/25/2019
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
Reassigned to Environment and Transportation Economic Matters
Proceedings
19 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {410115/1 Adopted
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2019
Legislative Date
3/16/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (99-35)
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
4/05/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (32-14)
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2019
Legislative Date
5/25/2019
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 605
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/25/2019 1/25/2019 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Regional Initiative to Limit or Reduce Greenhouse Gas Emissions in Transportation Sector - Authorization (Regional Transportation and Climate Protection Act of 2019)
House 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 Reassigned to Environment and Transportation Economic Matters 19 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2019 3/18/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/19/2019 3/15/2019 Favorable with Amendments {410115/1 Adopted 50 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/19/2019 3/15/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Regional Initiative to Limit or Reduce Greenhouse Gas Emissions in Transportation Sector - Authorization (Regional Transportation and Climate Protection Act of 2019)
House 3/20/2019 3/16/2019 Third Reading Passed (99-35) 51 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/20/2019 3/18/2019 Referred Rules 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2019 4/01/2019 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2019 4/05/2019 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Favorable Adopted 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Second Reading Passed 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Third Reading Passed (32-14) 63 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Returned Passed 67 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/25/2019 5/25/2019 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 605
Text - Chapter - Regional Initiative to Limit or Reduce Greenhouse Gas Emissions in Transportation Sector - Authorization (Regional Transportation and Climate Protection Act of 2019)
(   2-1204.2 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page