Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - Suspension of Driver's License or Registration - Unpaid Citations or Judgments
Sponsored by
The Speaker (By Request - Office of the Attorney General) and Delegates Lierman, Attar, Brooks, Cardin, Charkoudian, Crutchfield, W. Fisher, Lehman, Patterson, and Pena-Melnyk
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the requirements and procedures governing certain programs that authorize installment payments for certain motor vehicle traffic citations or judgment debts under certain circumstances; repealing the requirement that the Motor Vehicle Administration suspend a person's driver's license and vehicle registration for failure to pay a traffic citation or request a trial; authorizing the Administration to initiate an action for a certain civil judgment for an unpaid traffic citation under certain circumstances; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0234
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2020
Legislative Date
1/20/2020
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2020
Legislative Date
1/21/2020
Action
Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
Rereferred to Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2020
Legislative Date
2/04/2020
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/20/2020 1/20/2020 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Vehicle Laws - Suspension of Driver's License or Registration - Unpaid Citations or Judgments
House 1/21/2020 1/21/2020 Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 Rereferred to Judiciary
House 2/04/2020 2/04/2020 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/20/2020 5:24 PM