Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure - Charging Procedures and Documents - Citation
Sponsored by
Delegate Dumais
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Modifying the circumstances under which a police officer is required to charge by citation for certain misdemeanor or local ordinance violations that have an imprisonment penalty of up to 90 days; modifying the categories of offenses for which a police officer is authorized to charge by citation; and modifying the circumstances under which a police officer may charge a defendant by citation.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0341
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0323 Session: 2018 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2019
Legislative Date
1/25/2019
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2019
Legislative Date
1/25/2019
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Criminal Procedure - Charging Procedures and Documents - Citation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/06/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2019
Legislative Date
3/07/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Criminal Procedure - Charging Procedures and Documents - Citation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/08/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (88-47)
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
4/04/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/25/2019 1/25/2019 First Reading Judiciary
House 1/25/2019 1/25/2019 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Criminal Procedure - Charging Procedures and Documents - Citation
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 3/06/2019 3/06/2019 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 3/07/2019 3/07/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 42
Text - Third - Criminal Procedure - Charging Procedures and Documents - Citation
House 3/08/2019 3/08/2019 Third Reading Passed (88-47) 43
Senate 3/11/2019 3/11/2019 Referred Judicial Proceedings 43
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/04/2019 4/04/2019 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM