Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - Suspension of Driver's License or Registration - Unpaid Citations or Judgments
Sponsored by
The Speaker (By Request - Office of the Attorney General) and Delegates Lierman, Attar, Brooks, Cardin, Charkoudian, Crutchfield, W. Fisher, Lehman, Patterson, and Pena-Melnyk
Status
In the House - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the requirements and procedures governing certain programs that authorize installment payments for certain motor vehicle traffic citations or judgment debts; repealing certain provisions of law governing the requirement that the Motor Vehicle Administration suspend the driver's license and vehicle registration of a certain debtor; clarifying that a person may satisfy certain traffic citations by entering into a certain installment payment plan; applying the Act retroactively; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0234
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2020
Legislative Date
1/20/2020
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2020
Legislative Date
1/21/2020
Action
Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
Rereferred to Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2020
Legislative Date
2/04/2020
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {862714/1 Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
51
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
50
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/20/2020 1/20/2020 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Vehicle Laws - Suspension of Driver's License or Registration - Unpaid Citations or Judgments
House 1/21/2020 1/21/2020 Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 Hearing canceled
House 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 Rereferred to Judiciary
House 2/04/2020 2/04/2020 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 3/12/2020 3/12/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/12/2020 3/09/2020 Favorable with Amendments {862714/1 Adopted 46
House 3/12/2020 3/09/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46
Text - Third - Vehicle Laws - Suspension of Driver's License or Registration - Unpaid Citations or Judgments
House 3/13/2020 3/10/2020 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 47A
Senate 3/14/2020 3/09/2020 Referred Judicial Proceedings 48
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/15/2020 3/15/2020 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/15/2020 3/10/2020 Favorable Adopted 49
Senate 3/15/2020 3/10/2020 Second Reading Passed 49
Senate 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 51
House 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Returned Passed 50
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 4/1/2020 10:21 AM